Washington v. East Baton Rouge Parish School System et al

Plaintiff: Lester L. Washington
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish School System, EBRPSS Board of Directors, Charlotte Placide, Annette Mire, Diane Helire, Peggy Lede, Millie Williams, Demoine Rutledge and Elizabeth Duran Swinford
Case Number: 3:2009cv00662
Filed: August 19, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Of Dismissal: this matter is hereby DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/30/2011. (PJH)
April 12, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 37 Pltfs Notice/motion to file the waiver requests... is GRANTED only to the extent that proofs of service for all defts other than Decuir are deemed filed. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. FURTHER ORDERED that 38 pltfs motion is GRANTED only to the extent that pltf is given an additional 60 days from the date of this Order to effect service on Decuir. In all other respects, the motion is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 40 Pltfs Motion for Extension in compliance with the court order of 1/31/2011, is GRANTED only to the extent that (1) Within 45 days pltfs shall submit a copy of the actual Title VI administrative complaint submitted to EEOC and/or the results of the agency's determination, and the Right-to-Sue n otification. (2) Within 45 days pltfs shall submit a copy of the actual EEOC charge relating to the Title VII claims and a copy of the Right-to-Sue notification. In all other respects, the motion is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that no further extensions of time will be granted with regard to production of the requested documents and failure to comply shall result in a recommendation that pltfs claims be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 4/12/2011. (JDL)
January 31, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pltfs 25 Motion for equitable tolling is DISMISSED. FURTHER ORDERED that, within 30 days of this order, pltf shall submit a copy of the actual Title VI administrative complaint submitted to the EEOC and/or the results of the funding agency&# 039;s determination, and the Right-to-Sue notification on the same administrative complaint. Failure to comply shall result in a recommendation that pltfs Title VI claims be dismissed. FURTHER ORDERED that, within 30 days of this order, pltf shall s ubmit a copy of the actual EEOC charge relating to the Title VII claims of false information in personnel file and disclosure of medical information to the public, and a copy of the Right-to sue notification on the same EEOC charge. Failure to comply shall result in a recommendation that pltfs Title VII claims be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 1/31/2011. (JDL)
December 20, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING... 34 Motion is hereby DENIED as frivolous and lacking in merit and plaintiff is cautioned that continued filing of frivolous or vexatious documents will subject him to appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/17/10. (PJH) Modified on 12/20/2010 to edit text (PJH).
July 22, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion for recusal of the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 7/22/2010. (CMM, ) Modified on 7/23/2010 to mark as a written opinion. (CMM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. East Baton Rouge Parish School System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester L. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish School System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBRPSS Board of Directors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Placide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Mire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Helire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Lede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demoine Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Duran Swinford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?