Stelly v. Michael J. Astrue

Plaintiff: Dale Anthony Stelly
Defendant: Michael Astrue
Case Number: 3:2009cv00711
Filed: August 27, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 16 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs Under the Equal Access to Justice Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 3/15/11. (BP)
December 27, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT is hereby rendered in favor of the plaintiff Dale Anthony Stelly and against Michael J. Astrue, Commissioner of Social Security. Under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), the final decision of the Commissioner denying the plaintiff 9;s application for disability and supplemental security income (SSI) benefits is reversed and this matter is remanded to the Commissioner for reevaluation of the plaintiff's claim for benefits and issuance of a new decision. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/27/10. (BP)
December 9, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING on Social Security Appeal: Under sentence four of 42 USC § 405(g) the final decision of Michael J. Astrue, Commissioner of Social Security, denying the plts application for disability and supplemental security income (SSI) benefits is rev ersed. Judgment will be entered remanding the case for the Commissioner to correct his legal error, and conduct any administrative proceedings necessary to complete the record and issue a new decision. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/9/2010. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stelly v. Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Anthony Stelly
Represented By: Michael D. Breaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?