Benoit v. Louisiana State Penitentiary et al

Plaintiff: Terrence Benoit
Defendant: Louisiana State Penitentiary, 20th Judicial District Court and District Attorney - West Feliciana
Case Number: 3:2009cv00715
Filed: September 4, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 MOTION to Recover Awarded Costs. Plaintiff TERRENCE KNIGHT BENOIT (#489486) shall pay assessed costs in the amount of $29.80 in periodic installments as stated herein. Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this order to the acc ounting office or other person(s) or entity with responsibility for collecting and remitting to the District Court interim filing payments on behalf of prisoners, as designated by the facility in which the plaintiff is currently or subsequently confined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 3/10/11. (BP)
January 12, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 31 Report and Recommendations, of the U.S. Magistrate Judge on the 20 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Steven Bernard. The Motion for Summary Judgment of defendant Steven Bernard is GRANTED, DISMISSING the plaintiff� 39;s claims asserted against this defendant, without prejudice, for failure of the plaintiff to exhaust available administrative remedies pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a), and this action is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/11/11. (PJH)
December 6, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Steven Bernard. It is recommended that the motion for summary judgment of deft Steven Bernard, be granted, dismissing the pltfs claims asserted against this deft, without prejudice, for failure of the pltf to exhaust administrative remedies pursuant to 42 USC § 1997e, and that this action be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 12/23/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 12/6/2010. (JDL)
March 19, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 12 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The plaintiff's claims asserted against the La State Penitentiary, the La Department of Public Safety and Corrections, and the 20th Judicial District for the State of La are DISMISSED as barred by the Eleventh Amendment to the United States Constitution, the plaintiff's claims asserted against dft Burl Cain are DISMISSED, and the plaintiff's claims asserted pursuant to the Americans with Disabilities Act , 42 U.S.C. § 12101, et seq., are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Further this matter is referred back for further proceedings in connection with the plaintiff's claim of excessive force asserted against dft Steven Bernard. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 03/18/2010. (NLT)
February 25, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by Terrence Knight Benoit. It is recommended that the pla's claims asserted against the La State Penitentiary, the La Department of Public Safety and Corrections, and the 20th Judicial Dis trict for the State of La be dismissed as barred by the Eleventh Amendment to the United States Constitution, that the pla's claims asserted against dft Burl Cain be dismissed, and that the pla's claims asserted pursuant to the Americans wi th Disabilities Act, 42 U.S.C. § 12101, et seq., be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. It is further recommended that this matter be referred back for further proceedings in connection with the pla's claim of excessive force asserted against dft Steven Bernard. Objections to R&R due by 3/15/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 2/25/10. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benoit v. Louisiana State Penitentiary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Benoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 20th Judicial District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Attorney - West Feliciana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?