Johnson v. Rader et al
Plaintiff: |
Leonard Johnson, Jr, |
Defendant: |
Steve Rader, Charles Henyard, Thomas Blue and John Chase |
Case Number: |
3:2009cv00784 |
Filed: |
September 21, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Baton Rouge Office |
County: |
East Baton Rouge |
Presiding Judge: |
James J. Brady |
Presiding Judge: |
Docia L Dalby |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 26, 2010 |
Filing
30
RULING Adopting 29 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 25 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by John Chase, Charles Henyard is GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to exhaust available adminis trative remedies pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a), and with prejudice to refiling the claims in forma pauperis status. Further, the claims against Thomas Blue are DISMISSED pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed.R.Civ.P. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 05/26/2010. (NLT)
|
February 19, 2010 |
Filing
26
RULING Adopting 23 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Defts 20 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART, dismissing all of the pltfs claims except the claim the John Chase, Jr., Charles Henyard and Thomas Blue were deliberately indifferent to pltfs health and safety and this matter is REFERRED back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings on pltfs Eighth Amendment claim. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/19/2010. (JDL, )
|
January 25, 2010 |
Filing
23
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Chase, Charles Henyard, Steve Rader...It is recommended that the defts motion dismiss be granted in part, dismissing all of the pltfs claims except the claim that John Chase, J r., Charles Henyard and Thomas Blue were deliberately indifferent to the pltfs health and safety and this matter be referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings on the pltfs Eighth Amendment claim... Objections to R&R due by 2/11/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 1/25/2010. (JDL, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?