Tyson v. Jacobs Field Services North America, Inc.

Plaintiff: Danny Tyson
Defendant: Jacobs Field Services North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00875
Filed: October 13, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Approving the Report and Recommendation and adopting it as its own opinion herein. Accordingly, the 45 motion to remand is Granted, and the pending motion by pltf for leave to file a response to dfts' objection is Terminated as moot.. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/21/2011. (CMM) (Main Document 54 replaced on 12/21/2011) (CMM). Modified on 12/21/2011 to edit text. (CMM)
March 4, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 6 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the plaintiff's 4 motion to remand is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 3/4/2010. (CMM,)
January 13, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 4 MOTION to Remand filed by Danny Tyson...It is recommended that the pltfs motion to remand be DENIED... Objections to R&R due by 2/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 1/13/2010. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyson v. Jacobs Field Services North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Tyson
Represented By: Thomas E. Loehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobs Field Services North America, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?