Humana Insurance Company v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Humana Insurance Company
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv00902
Filed: October 19, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER The Motion to Dismiss 47 filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is GRANTED and It Is ORDERED that the complaint filed by Humana Insurance Company be, and is, hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. The remaining actions are referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/17/2010. (JDL)
August 11, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: 45 Motion to Substitute Party Plaintiff filed by plaintiff Humana Insurance Company is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/10/2010. (JDL, )
June 25, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 31 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall serve its answers and produce documents in response to the defendant's Interrogatories and Request for Production, without objections, within 14 days. Pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5)(A), the plaintiff is also ordered to pay to the defendant, within 14 days, reasonable expenses in the amount of $200.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 6/25/10. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humana Insurance Company v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humana Insurance Company
Represented By: Layna S. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?