Becnel v. Department of Social Services, Office of Community Services

Case Number: 3:2009cv00988
Filed: November 19, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Department of Social Services, Office ofCommunity Services; Brent Villamarette, in his individual and official capacities; Peggy Dottery, in her individual and official capacities; and Deborah Tanner, in her individual and official capacities against Kiease Becnel dismissing the claims of the plaintiff with prejudice.. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 06/13/2011. (KDC)
May 19, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 26 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or In the Alternative for More Definite Statement filed by defendant, Department of Social Services, Office of Community Services, shall be DENIED. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 5/19/09. (BP, ) Modified on 6/26/2009 to correct text (BP, ).
April 9, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 13 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Department of Social Services, Office of Community Services. It is recommended that the Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or In the Alternative for More Definite Statement (R. Doc. 13) filed by defendant, Department of Social Services, Office of Community Services, should be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 4/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 4/9/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Becnel v. Department of Social Services, Office of Community Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?