De Lage Landen Financial Services, Inc. v. Perkins Rowe Associates, LLC et al

Case Number: 3:2009cv00990
Filed: November 19, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 98 Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties are instructed to contact the Court to set the briefing schedule on the issue of damages. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 05/11/11. (PAH)
April 28, 2011 108 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER on Stipulated Facts and Dismissal with Prejudice of the claims between DLL and Intervenors as set forth in the Settlement Agreement, each party to this Consent Order shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/28/2011. (JDL)
April 18, 2011 103 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 96 Third-Party Deft Cisco Systems Capital Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/18/2011. (JDL)
April 7, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying Delage's 88 Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying Third-Party plaintiffs KeyBank and JLLA's 89 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/6/2011. (PJH)
November 16, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 70 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 73 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/16/10. (BP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Lage Landen Financial Services, Inc. v. Perkins Rowe Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?