White v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al

Case Number: 3:2009cv00991
Filed: November 19, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 45 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defendants, and this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/5/2011. (JDL)
August 4, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion for Contempt and sanctions against Maverick. Pltf shall conduct a reasonable search of all sources for the requested documents, and shall provide a supplemental response to the discovery requests on or before 8/22/2011. In all other respects, the motion is DENIED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 8/3/2011. (CMM)
May 9, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: as to 39 Order requiring defts to submit, for in camera review, a list of all agent Michelli's criminal convictions over 10 years...IT IS ORDERED that evidence relating to Michelli's criminal conviction is not subject to production in this lawsuit, and no further inquiry into the criminal conviction is allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 5/6/2011. (JDL)
October 22, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 7 Motion to Dismiss as to pla's claims of retaliation under LSA-R.S. 51:2256, abuse of rights, and breach of the implied duty of good faith. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/21/10. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?