Phillips v. Cain et al

Case Number: 3:2009cv00999
Filed: November 23, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 22 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and 17 pltfs motion for new trial is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/19/2010. (JDL, )
February 23, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 10 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. This action is dismissed, without prejudice, as a result of the plaintiff's failure to exhaust administrative remedies as mandated by 42 U.S.C. §1997e. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/23/10. (BP, )
February 3, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by Thomas L. Phillips. It is recommended that this action be dismissed, without prejudice, as a result of the plaintiff's failure to exhaust administrative remedies as mandated by 42 U.S.C. § 1997e. Objections to R&R due by 2/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 2/3/10. (BP, )
December 16, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This order be served on the Centralized Inmate Banking Office for the LA DPS&C for issuance of a check in the amount of $350.00 drawn against petitioner's inmate drawing and/or savings account. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall maintain sufficient funds to cover payment of the docketing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 12/16/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?