Wells et al v. FEMA et al

Case Number: 3:2009cv01012
Filed: November 30, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1983 Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 24, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 17 Motion for relief from judgment. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/23/2010. (JDL)
November 4, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 13 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Plaintiffs' claims against defendants FEMA and W. Craig Fugate shall be dismissed, pursuant to Rule 4(m), for failure to timely complete service of process by serving the U.S. Attorney for this district. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/3/10. (BP)
October 12, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by Kelda Price Wells, Kelvin Wells. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the plaintiffs' claims against defendants FEMA and W. Craig Fugate be dismissed, pursuant to Rule 4(m), for failure to timely complete service of process by serving the U.S. Attorney for this district. Objections to R&R due by 10/29/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/12/10. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells et al v. FEMA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?