Robinson v. Prince et al

Case Number: 3:2009cv01060
Filed: December 22, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 17 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 shall be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/1/10. (BP)
October 4, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Willie Robinson, Jr. It is recommended that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus should be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 10/21/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 10/4/2010. (JDL, )
July 1, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 13 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is not dismissed as procedurally barred. The State of Louisiana (through the District Attorney for the 20th Judicial District) is ordered to file a response to the merits of the claims contained in Robinson's habeas petition. 10 Motion for Contempt filed by Willie Robinson, Jr. is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 7/1/10. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Prince et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?