Richardson v. Wilkinson et al

Case Number: 3:2010cv00062
Filed: January 22, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER adopting the 66 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge as the Court's opinion. Therefore, Petitioner's RULE 60(b) 58 Motion is DENIED. The 69 Motion for Certificate of Appelability is also DENIED because Petitioner failed to " make a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right." 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(2). Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/5/2014. (LLH)
August 31, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting of the U.S. Magistrate Judge the petition of Travis Richardson for a writ of habeas corpus isdenied.. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/31/2011. (PJH)
June 2, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court Ruling denying 20 Motion Requesting that a Ruling be Made. The court will address the petitioner's motion to supplement in the magistrate judge's report which will be issued in due course.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 6/2/2010. (CMM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Wilkinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?