Flint et al v. Jalin, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2010cv00113
Filed: February 17, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2015 73 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER as to 72 MOTION for Review on the Notice of Application to Have Costs Taxed filed by Jalin, Inc. and Robert Earl McPeak. The supplemental notice is REFERRED to the Clerk of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/15/2015. (LLH)
February 9, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 64 MOTION for a New Trial, or in the Alternative, Motion to Amend Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/9/2015. (LLH)
February 23, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 24 Report and Recommendations, of the U.S. Magistrate Judge on the 12 Motion to Dismiss filed by State of Louisiana through the Department of Transportation and Development (DOTD). Accordingly, the plaintiffs' claim against defendant Ray Palmer shall be DISMISSED, without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 4(m). Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 02/23/11. (PAH)
June 14, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 10 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and 4 Pltfs Motion to Remand is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/11/2010. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flint et al v. Jalin, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?