Poydras v. State of Louisiana

Case Number: 3:2010cv00117
Filed: February 18, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Pltfs 28 Motion for New Trial and 29 Supplemental Motion for New Trial pursuant to FRCP 59, is denied for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/19/2010. (JDL, )
April 19, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 31 Motion to Amend and 31 Motion for New Trial...Accordingly, Plaintiff's Supplemental Motion for New Trial pursuant to Rule 59, Fed.R.Civ.P. and Request for Leave to Amend and Supplement Pleadings is denied for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/19/2010. (LSM, )
April 5, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 5, 13 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The pltfs complaint is DISMISSED as frivolous pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(1) and without prejudice to any state law claim. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/5/2010. (CMM, )
March 24, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL Pltfs complaint is DISMISSED as frivolous pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(1) and without prejudice to any state law claim. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/24/2010. (JDL, )
March 23, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by David W. Poydras...It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the plaintiff's original and amended complaints be dismissed as frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (e)(2)(B)(i) and without prejudice to any state law claim. Objections to R&R due by 4/9/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 3/22/2010. (CMM,)
March 5, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by David W. Poydras...It is recommended that the pltfs complaint be dismissed as frivolous pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and without prejudice to any state law claim... Objections to R&R due by 3/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 3/5/2010. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poydras v. State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?