Bishop et al v. Gill Industries, Ltd et al

Case Number: 3:2010cv00124
Filed: February 19, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED RULING on 45 MOTION to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/7/2011. (JDL)
November 24, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 30 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 8 Motion to Remand filed by Helen J. Thacker, Mel M Bishop is denied. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/24/10. (BP)
November 5, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Helen J. Thacker, Mel M Bishop. It is again recommended that the motion to remand be denied. Objections to R&R due by 11/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/5/10. (PJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop et al v. Gill Industries, Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?