Stogner v. Sturdivant et al

Case Number: 3:2010cv00125
Filed: February 22, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2011 111 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING & ORDER: Plaintiff, Michelle Stogner, and/or her counsel shall pay defendants, Willie Graves, Sheriff of Livingston Parish; Randy Dufrene, Chief of Police for the Town of Livingston, and Livingston Parish Sheriffs Deputies, Chris Sturdivant, J ason Ard, Alex Petho, Randy Dufrene, Jr., and Aldon Thomassen, $2,820.00 in attorneys fees that were incurred by defendants in opposing plaintiffs Motion for Permission to Disclose Expert Witnesses Out of Time.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 12/9/2011. (LSM) Modified on 12/9/2011 to edit text (LSM).
September 22, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING & ORDER denying 84 Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs former divorce attorney, Charlotte Pugh, shall comply with the subpoena directed to her by defendants within twenty (20) days of this O rder. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the health care providers and pharmacy listed below shall comply with the subpoena directed to them by defendants, within twenty (20)days of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this Order shall be served upon the following stated within. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 9/21/2011. (LSM)
November 9, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying Plaintiff's 76 Ex Parte Motion for Rule 54(B) Certification, because Plaintiff has failed to establish any of the prerequisites for certification for immediate appeal under either F.R.C.P. 54(b) or Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/9/2010. (CMM) Modified on 11/9/2010 to edit text. (CMM)
October 14, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Court hereby GRANTS Defendants Motions for Partial Summary Judgment on all of Plaintiffs § 1983 claims against Graves 23 , Petho 21 , and Dufrene, Jr 21 . The Court also GRANTS Defendants Motions for Partial Summary Judgment on P laintiffs § 1983 claims against Sturdivant for conducting a warrantless search and seizure on Stogner and deliberate indifference and DENIES the Motion as to Plaintiffs § 1983 claims against Sturdivant for using excessive force 21 .. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/14/2010. (CMM)
September 30, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Court DENIES Melerine's 20 Motion to Dismiss. Moreover, because there are genuine issues of material fact regarding whether Melerine was acting in the course and scope of his employment with the LPD, the Court DENIES Dufrene's 20 Motion to Dismiss as to Pltfs claims against him for vicarious and strict liability. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/30/2010. (JDL, )
September 14, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Because pltfs has no right to relief under the Convention, 25 Defts 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss Claims Under United Nations Convention against Torture by Sheriff Willie Graves and Deputy Chris Sturdivant is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/13/2010. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stogner v. Sturdivant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?