Weir v. Department of Corrections et al

Respondent: Department of Corrections, Chris Fontenot, Lieutenant Colonel Killborne, James M LeBlanc, Janet Lorena, Paul Payne, Deputy Warden Steve Rader, James Stevens and Keithe Turner
DCI: Lieutenant Colonel Brumfield
Case Number: 3:2010cv00191
Filed: March 24, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 37 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Defendants' 34 motion to dismiss is granted. Plaintiff's claims asserted against defendant Curtis Thurman are dismissed for the same reason pursuant to 42 U.S. C. § 1915(e) and 1915A. The plaintiff's 33 motion for summary judgment is denied. The 35 motion for summary judgment of defendant James Stevens is granted, dismissing plaintiff's claim of excessive force asserted against this defendant with prejudice. This entire action is dismissed. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 1/9/12. (DCB) Modified on 1/9/2012 (DCB).
January 18, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 MOTION for Transfer to a Privately Owned Correctional Center. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 1/18/11. (BP)
March 23, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 4 , Case transferred to USDC, Middle District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/23/2010. (NEF: MAG-5)(caa, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/24/2010.]
February 26, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Complaint filed by Paul Joseph Weir. Objections to R&R due by 3/12/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alma L. Chasez on 2/25/10.(ala, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/24/2010.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weir v. Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Dci: Lieutenant Colonel Brumfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chris Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lieutenant Colonel Killborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James M LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Janet Lorena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deputy Warden Steve Rader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Keithe Turner
Represented By: Paul Joseph Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?