Hoyt v. Cain et al

Petitioner: Johnny Mitchell Hoyt
Respondent: Burl Cain and James D. Caldwell, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00300
Filed: April 27, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER denying 22 Motion for Relief of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP Rule 60. A motion for certificate of appealability be denied for the reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/26/2015. (SMG)
January 13, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 10 Report and Recommendations, of the U.S. Magistrate Judge..IT IS ORDERED that the petitioner's application for habeas corpus relief shall be dismissed as untimely. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 01/13/11. (PAH)
December 6, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Johnny Mitchell Hoyt. It is recommended that the petitioner's application for habeas corpus relief be dismissed as untimely. Objections to R&R due by 12/23/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 12/6/10. (BP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoyt v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James D. Caldwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Johnny Mitchell Hoyt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?