Majestic Offshore, LLC et al v. In-Depth Offshore Technologies International, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Advance Marine Services Corp and Majestic Offshore, LLC
Defendant: BP America Inc., Helix Energy Solutions Group, Inc, Hesham el Abrikgy, In-Depth Offshore Technologies International, Inc and Saipem American, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00384
Filed: June 7, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 68 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/23/2012. (LSM)
March 15, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The 33 MOTION to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. In view of the amended complaint, the motions (docs. 24, 26, 28 and 29) to dismiss are DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/15/2011. (JDL)
September 30, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 6 Motion for More Definite Statement; granting 6 Motion to Dismiss; granting 8 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying 9 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs are Ordered to amend their complaint within 30 days to properly allege their claims as provided herein.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/29/2010. (CMM,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Majestic Offshore, LLC et al v. In-Depth Offshore Technologies International, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advance Marine Services Corp
Represented By: Stanley Stephen Spring, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Majestic Offshore, LLC
Represented By: Stanley Stephen Spring, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helix Energy Solutions Group, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hesham el Abrikgy
Represented By: Scott T. Winstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: In-Depth Offshore Technologies International, Inc
Represented By: Scott T. Winstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saipem American, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?