Bach et al v. Amedisys, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Diane E. Bach and Robert F. Bach
Defendant: Amedisys, Inc., William F. Borne and Dale E. Redman
Case Number: 3:2010cv00395
Filed: June 10, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2016 294 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 279 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs' Section lO(b) and Rule lOb-5 claims against Graham, Redman, Giblin, Browne, and Schwartz are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, an d Plaintiffs' Section 20(a) claims against Browne and Giblin are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs' Section lO(b) and Rule lOb-5 claims against Amedisys, Borne, and Jeter, and Plaintiffs' Section 20(a) claims against Borne, Jeter, Schwartz, Redman, and Graham, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 08/19/2016. (ELW)
September 5, 2013 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE: Plaintiff's 233 Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Shareholder Derivative Settlement and Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED the captioned matter, as well as the captioned consolidated matters, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All parties shall bear their own costs, except as explicitly provided in the Stipulation and in this Order of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 09/04/2013. (NLT)
April 20, 2011 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: as to 142 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Linda Trammell, Wanda Corbin, Pia Galimba, Gregory H. Browne and John F. Giblin terminated. IT IS ORDERED that all claims asserted against dfts, Gregory H. Browne, and John F. Gib lin, in the consolidated ERISA actions, Corbin v. Amedisys, Inc., et al, 10-642-BAJ-CN and Galimba v. Amedisys, Inc., et al, 10-732-BAJ-CN, are hereby Dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the F.R.C.P.. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 4/20/2011. (CMM)
February 2, 2011 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 92 Motion for J. Gerard Stranch, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Laborers' District Council and Contractors' Pension Fund of Ohio, Derivatively on behalf of defendant Amedysis, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 2/2/2011. (PJH)
October 22, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 40 Motion to Vacate or amend the consolidation order as stated herein; granting 51 Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Counsel and Co-Liaison Counsel as stated herein; granting 23 Motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and for approval of lead counsel and liaison counsel by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi and Puerto Rico Teachers' Retirement System as stated herein; All pending motions other than those granted herein are denied. Lead counsel and defense counsel shall, within 30 days of this order, submit a proposed scheduling order as stated herein. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/21/10. (BP, ) Modified on 10/22/2010 to edit text (BP, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bach et al v. Amedisys, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amedisys, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William F. Borne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale E. Redman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane E. Bach
Represented By: Michael E. Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert F. Bach
Represented By: Michael E. Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?