International Mezzo Technologies, Inc. v. Frontline Aerospace, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: International Mezzo Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Frontline Aerospace, Inc. and Ryan Wood
Case Number: 3:2010cv00397
Filed: June 10, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING 71 Defts SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery is granted in part and denied in part. By noon on 10/4/2011, the pltf shall produce all documents described. The Attorney's Eyes Only designation of the Master Services and License Agreement previously produced to the defts is lifted and the agreement is designated as Confidential Information. The parties shall bear their respective costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/27/2011. (JDL)
September 27, 2011 108 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 81 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/27/2011. (JDL)
October 22, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 26 MOTION to Dismiss, or alternatively for More Definite Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/22/10. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Mezzo Technologies, Inc. v. Frontline Aerospace, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontline Aerospace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Mezzo Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Juston M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?