Kearns & Associates Company et al v. Carter et al

Plaintiff: Kearns & Associates Company and S&P Specialities Company LLC
Defendant: Ricky S. Carter and Ricky Carter & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00439
Filed: July 2, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2014 164 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Carter Parties' 159 Second Motion to Enforce Stipulated Settlement and Motion to Submit Judgment in Accordance with Stipulated Settlement filed by defendants Ricky S. Carter and Ricky Carter & Associates, Inc., and S & P Specialties Company, LLC, counter-claim plaintiff, is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/17/2014. (JDL)
August 2, 2012 111 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Pltfs 80 Motion for Summary Judgment as to the defts Seventh Counterclaim and the defts First and Second Counterclaim and Crossclaims for Tortious Interference with Business Relations, is granted. The remaining aspects of the pltfs motion are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/1/2012. (JDL)
November 2, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 32 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/2/2011. (CMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kearns & Associates Company et al v. Carter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky S. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Carter & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kearns & Associates Company
Represented By: Donna Phillips Currault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S&P Specialities Company LLC
Represented By: Donna Phillips Currault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?