Hogan et al v. LeBlanc et al

Plaintiff: Elliot Hogan
Defendant: Burl Cain, Unknown Coiben, John Doe, C. Jackson, James LeBlanc, Unknown Roundtree and Unknown Simmon
Case Number: 3:2010cv00495
Filed: July 28, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 51 Report and Recommendations. Accordingly, the dft's 43 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted and this action is dismissed. Further, the claims against dft C. Jackson and the unidentified John Doe doctors are Dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed.R.Civ.P.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/24/2012. (CMM)
January 11, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 18 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and defts 14 Motion to Dismiss is granted and the claims against them are dismissed without prejudice to any state law claims against Secretary LeBlanc, Warden Cain and Sgt. Simon. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 1/10/2011. (JDL)
November 12, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 15 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Unknown Coiben. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the defendants 15 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted and the claims against Dr. Shay Co rban be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust available administrative remedies pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a), and with prejudice to refiling the claims in forma pauperis status. It is further recommended that the court decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over any state law claim against Dr. Corban. Objections to R&R due by 11/29/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/12/2010. (CMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogan et al v. LeBlanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Coiben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Roundtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Simmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliot Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?