Gipson v. Prince et al

Plaintiff: Eric Bernard Gipson
Defendant: Unknown Chestnut, Unknown Hall, Johnny Prejean, Howard Prince, Unknown Richardson and Unknown Woods
Case Number: 3:2010cv00508
Filed: August 4, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 36 Report and Recommendations, of the U.S. Magistrate Judge..IT is Ordered that the pltf's claims against defendants Asst. Warden Hall, Lt. Woods and MSgt. Richardson shall be dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 4(m). Judgment shall be entered accordingly.. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 02/09/11. (PAH)
December 2, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION: The 9 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Johnny Prejean, Howard Prince, Unknown Chestnut shall be granted and the claims against defts Howard Prince, Carolyn Chestnut and Dr. Johnny Prejean shall be dismissed. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 12/01/2010. (NLT)
November 8, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 9 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Dr. Johnny Prejean, Howard Prince, Carolyn Chestnut. It is recommended that the defts motion for summary judgment be granted and the claims against defts Howard Prince, Carolyn Chestnut and Dr. Johnny Prejean be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 11/26/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/8/2010. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gipson v. Prince et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Chestnut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bernard Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?