Jones

Plaintiff: Joseph Jones
Defendant: Louisiana Public Service Commision, Louisiana of Department of Environmental Quality and Thomas Vilsack
Case Number: 3:2010cv00525
Filed: August 12, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 57 Motion to Dismiss, dismissing USDA and its secretary, Thomas Vilsack. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/31/12. (DCB)
September 22, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING... Defendants Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality and Louisiana Public Service Commission motions to dismiss [42 and 43] are GRANTED and plaintiffs claims against these two parties are hereby DISMISSED. Plaintiffs motion to reconsider the dismissal of the Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals [doc. 54] is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/22/2011. (LSM)
July 26, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 35 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 40 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental More Definite Statement LPSC, LDEQ, and LDHH filed by Joseph Jones.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/25/2011. (CMM)
October 15, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 10/15/10. (BP, ) Modified on 10/18/2010 to edit document type (BP, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Public Service Commision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana of Department of Environmental Quality
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Vilsack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?