Stipe v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Bruce Stipe
Defendant: Patrick Cockran, Unknown Durbin, Unknown Grimes, Denise Harris, Charlene Haydel, Greg McKey, Cindy Park, John Prejean and Seth Smith
Case Number: 3:2010cv00576
Filed: September 1, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. the Court declines supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiff's state law claims and the defendants' Motion to Dismiss, (doc. 29) is granted, dismissing the plaintiff's claims asserted ag ainst the defendants, without prejudice to any state law claims which the plaintiff may have. In light of the Court's disposition of the defendants' Motion to Dismiss, the plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, (doc. 38) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/30/2011. (PJH)
July 21, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 86 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Unknown Durbin, Denise Harris, Unknown Grimes, Cindy Park, John Prejean, Seth Smith, Patrick Cockran, Greg McKey, Charlene Haydel, 89 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordin gly, dft's 86 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice as Rule 11 Sanction, is granted in part, such that the Court deems as proven in this case that on the date of the accident complained of, 6/11/2010, the pltf was assigned to a lower bunk on Tier C at the EHCC Beaver 5 housing unit and was on that date housed in a cell which was not occupied by a co-inmate. This action is referred back to Magistrate Judge Christine Noland for further proceedings.. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/20/2011. (CMM)
January 6, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; denying 54 MOTION to Inform the Court of Retaliation. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/5/11. (BP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stipe v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Cockran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Durbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene Haydel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg McKey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Stipe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?