Robinson v. Our Lady of the Lake Regional Medical Center, INC.

Plaintiff: Sahran Wilson Robinson
Defendant: Our Lady of the Lake Regional Medical Center, INC.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00584
Filed: September 3, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION DENYING 76 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Stanwood Duval, Jr on 9/23/2013. (swd)
April 24, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION DENYING 73 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Stanwood Duval, Jr on 4/23/2013. (swd)
November 27, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION: GRANTING as to 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Our Lady of the Lake Regional Medical Center, Inc. Signed by Judge Stanwood Duval, Jr on 11/27/2012. (swd)
December 6, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting 26 MOTION for Partial Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Our Lady of the Lake Regional Medical Center, Inc. Signed by Judge Stanwood Duval, Jr on 12/5/2011. (BLG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Our Lady of the Lake Regional Medical Center, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Our Lady of the Lake Regional Medical Center, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sahran Wilson Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?