Williams et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al

Plaintiff: Alfreda Rodney Williams and Peter James Williams
Defendant: Board of Directors Guaranty Bank & Trust Co. and United States Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 3:2010cv00610
Filed: September 14, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting defendant's 20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or,Alternatively, for Failure to State a Claim by Guaranty Bank & TrustCO.'s.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/30/2011. (PJH)
January 24, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 11 Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have ten (10) days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint. Defendant shall have ten (10) days from the date the amended complaint is filed to file its opposition.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/24/2011. (CMM)
December 6, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 8 Motion to Dismiss as to dft United States Department of Agriculture. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/6/10. (BP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Directors Guaranty Bank & Trust Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfreda Rodney Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter James Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?