Pierre v. LeBlanc et al

Plaintiff: Deidre Pierre
Defendant: Trulinda Augillard, Mary Kennedy, James LeBlanc, Connie Moore, Howard Prince, Jim Rogers and Lynette Tucker
Case Number: 3:2010cv00618
Filed: September 15, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 41 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The plaintiff's Rehabilitation Act and Americans with Disabilities Act claims alleged in the amended complaint are DISMISSED as frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(e)(2)(B)(i), and this action is DISMISSED. The Appointment of counsel is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 01/26/2012. (NLT)
October 5, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 30 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge : The 13 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted. Further, plaintiff's claims alleged in the amended complaint are dismissed as frivolous and this action is dismissed. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/5/11. (DCB)
December 6, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Staying Discovery: IT IS ORDERED that the 17 Motion to Stay Discovery is granted and all discovery in the above-entitled matter is stayed until the ruling on the defendants' 13 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment or until further order of the court. Schultea v. Wood, 47 F.3d 1427 (5th Cir. 1995).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/6/2010. (CMM) Modified on 12/6/2010 to edit text. (CMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierre v. LeBlanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trulinda Augillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynette Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deidre Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?