Durbin v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Ted Durbin
Defendant: Unknown Barrio, K. Benjamin, Burl Cain, Unknown Darbonne, T. Delaney, Unknown Delaughter, B. Dodd, Leslie Dupont, C. Fontenot, R. Jett, J. Lamartinere, Richard Peabody, T. Poret, Unknown Toney, Unknown Turner, Unknown Valant and Darrel Vannoy
Case Number: 3:2010cv00655
Filed: October 1, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 67 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The defendant's 57 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, the plaintiff's 66 Motion for Leave to Amend Original Complaint is DENIED and this action is DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/11/2013. (SMG)
March 9, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 49 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pltfs 41 and 48 Motions for Summary Judgment are DENIED and the 46 Motion for Summary Judgment of defts Burl Cain and Darrell Vannoy is GRANTED IN PART, such that pl tfs claim that deft Darrel Vannoy has refused to allow the pltf to celebrate Jewish religious holiday is DISMISSED, and this matter is referred back for further proceedings in connection with pltfs claim asserted against deft Burl Cain. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/8/2012. (JDL)
June 27, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL RULING and ORDER regarding 34 RULING Adopting Report and Recommendation issued on 6/3/2011. Pltf has filed an objection. The court has reviewed pltfs submissions (docs. 33 and 35). The only argument with merit relates to the claims t hat were referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Accordingly, the court simply reinstates its prior ruling approving and adopting the report, with the added notation that pltfs objection lacks merit. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/27/2011. (JDL)
June 6, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 32 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge as to the 13 Motion to Dismiss. The plaintiff's claims asserted against Msgt. Turner are DISMISSED for failure of the plaintiff to serve this defendant within 120 da ys as mandated by Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Further, the defendants' Motion to Dismiss (doc. no. 13) is GRANTED IN PART, dismissing the plaintiff's claims asserted against defendants leslie Dupont, Richard Peabody, Ronnie Jett, Bruce Dodd, Tim Delaney, Troy Poret, Joseph lamartinere, Cathy Fontenot, Robert Toney, Brad Delaughter, landry Valant, Randy Barrios, Kevin Benjamin and Chad Darbonne, with prejudice, dismissing the plaintiff's claims asserted agai nst the remaining defendants, Burl Cain and Darrel Vannoy, for monetary damages in the defendants' official capacities, and this action is referred back for further proceedings in connection with the plaintiff's claims that his First Amendm ent right to freely practice his religion and his Fourteenth Amendment right to equal protection have been violated by the defendants' refusal to allow him to congregate with members of his faith and refusal to allow him to attend services and g atherings of the Jewish community at the main prison complex (as do members of other religious faiths at LSP), and that prison officials refuse to recognize Jewish holy days or afford inmates an opportunity to congregate, worship or attend services on such days. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/3/2011. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durbin v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Barrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Darbonne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Delaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Dupont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Jett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lamartinere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Peabody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Poret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Toney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Valant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Durbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?