RPM Pizza, LLC v. Argonaut Great Central Insurance Company

Plaintiff: RPM Pizza, LLC
Defendant: Argonaut Great Central Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv00684
Filed: October 8, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2014 347 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER: RPM Pizza, LLC's 219 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Argonaut Great Central Insurance Company's 203 Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Coverage for Claims Administration Costs is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/6/2014. (SMG)
January 23, 2014 276 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 250 Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Rule30(b)(6) Deposition of Domino's Pizza. Argonaut Great Central Insurance Company's request for an order compelling Domino's to appear for a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 01/23/2014. (NLT)
November 20, 2013 186 Opinion or Order of the Court PARTIAL RULING granting in part 163 Ex Parte MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses with Incorporated Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/20/2013. (NLT) Modified on 11/20/2013 to edit the text (NLT).
November 15, 2013 184 Opinion or Order of the Court PARTIAL RULING granting in part 161 Second MOTION to Compel filed by Domino's Pizza LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/15/2013. (NLT)
October 24, 2013 160 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 141 Motion to Compel the Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses. RPM may file a another motion to compel based on discovery issues that remain in dispute. If a new motion is necessary, RPM must file the motion by 11/15/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/24/2013. (NLT)
August 27, 2013 133 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER : Plaintiff RPM's 95 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is hereby DENIED; Defendant's 97 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ) is also DENIED; Plaintiff RPM's 109 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Opposition is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/25/2013. (LLH)
August 20, 2013 128 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/19/2013. (LLH)
July 31, 2013 126 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 111 and 112 Motions for Reconsideration; denying as moot 119 and 125 Ex Parte MOTIONS for Leave to File a Reply to Argonaut's Memorandum in Opposition. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/30/2013. (SMG)
March 28, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING on Plaintiffs' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment (docs. 35, 58) are hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant's Cross-Motion for Final Summary Judgment (doc. 69) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Opposition (doc. 86) is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/28/2013. (PJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RPM Pizza, LLC v. Argonaut Great Central Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argonaut Great Central Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Riche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RPM Pizza, LLC
Represented By: Eugene R. Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?