Jordan v. Mitchell et al

Plaintiff: Edmond D. Jordan
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security/Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA), Jill Igert and Mary Mitchell
Case Number: 3:2010cv00746
Filed: November 2, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 55 Motion For Clarification of the Courts ruling granting Defendants motion to dismiss and, alternatively, renewed motion for summary judgment. Judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/23/2013. (LLH)
July 19, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 47 Motion to Dismiss. ; granting renewed 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs WPA claims are dismissed. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/19/2013. (LLH)
February 26, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part Defendant Janet Napolitano's 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Plaintiff's hostile work environment and constructive discharge claims are dismissed. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/26/2013. (LLH)
July 12, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Accordingly, the Court hereby GRANTS Defendants motions 10 & 17 to dismiss, in part, as they relate to Plaintiffs civil conspiracy claim under 42 U.S.C. § 1985(3). In addition, the Court hereby DENIES Defendants motions 10 & 17 to dismiss as to each of Plaintiffs remaining claims.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/7/2011. (CMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Mitchell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security/Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Igert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmond D. Jordan
Represented By: Elton Heron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?