Jackson v. Hartley

Plaintiff: Kennedy Jackson
Defendant: Unknown Hartley
Case Number: 3:2010cv00792
Filed: November 22, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE and ORDER FIXING TIME TO RESPOND: IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have 14 days to file a response to this notice. The response may include identification of, and support for, any genuinely disputed material facts and the legal authorities which indicate that summary judgement for the defendant on the ground stated above is not appropriate, along with a supporting memorandum.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/11/2012. (CMM)
October 5, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting the Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the 20 Motion for Summary Judgment filed on behalf of dft Lt. Marvin Hartley is Denied.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/5/2011. (CMM)
August 8, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The court has carefully considered the petition, the record, the law applicable to this action, and the 23 Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Stephen C. Riedlinger dated June 3, 2011, and the objection filed by the dft. The court refers this matter back to the Magistrate Judge for further consideration... Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/5/2011. (CMM) Modified on 8/8/2011 to edit text. (CMM)
March 31, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 12 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 11 Motion for Partial Dismissal filed by Lt. Marvin Hartley is granted, dismissing the plaintiff's claims brought against the defendant in his official capacity. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/31/11. (BP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennedy Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?