Wells v. Vannoy

Plaintiff: Tyronne Wells
Defendant: Cindy Vannoy
Case Number: 3:2010cv00821
Filed: December 8, 2010
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2012 99 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 97 Report and Recommendations, 60 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Cindy Vannoy, 81 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Tyronne Wells of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The plaintiffs motion for summary judgment be denied, that the defendants motion for summary judgment be granted, and this action be dismissed. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 09/06/2012. (SMG)
May 2, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 72 Sealed Ex Parte Motion to FIle Training Outlines Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 5/1/2012. (JDL) Modified on 5/3/2012 to unseal ruling, per chambers (JDL).
July 14, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 43 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and Defts 21 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART, dismissing all of the plaintiffs claims except the plaintiffs claim that Vannoy improperly rejected the book Pimpology i n violation of his constitutional rights. Further, the court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over any state law claim. This matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for consideration of the amended complaint. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/13/2011. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyronne Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?