Nelson et al v. Louise, et al
Plaintiff: |
Jerome Nelson, Kathy Nelson, Saluta Nelson, Tasha Nelson and William Nelson |
Defendant: |
Derik Louise |
Case Number: |
3:2010cv00827 |
Filed: |
December 9, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Baton Rouge Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Ralph E. Tyson |
Presiding Judge: |
Christine Noland |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 21, 2014 |
Filing
40
RULING adopting 37 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiffs' state law claims are declined and plaintiffs' complaint and amended complaint are DISMISSED, with prejudice, for failure to state a claim in accordance with the screening provisions of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B), and without prejudice to any state law claims the plaintiffs may have. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/20/2014. (SMG)
|
August 17, 2011 |
Filing
30
RULING Adopting 27 Report and Recommendations of the magistrate judge. Accordingly, pltfs' 2 , 3 , 4 , 5 , 6 , applications to proceed in forma pauperis are denied, and the filing and service fee shall be paid by plfs on or before 8/31/20 11. Further, in accordance with the denial of their application to proceed in forma pauperis, pltfs shall be held responsible for service of the summons and complaint/amended complaint upon the dfts.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/16/2011. (CMM)
|
July 22, 2011 |
Filing
26
ORDER denying 25 Motion for Judge Ralph Tyson and Judge Docia L Dalby to Take Judicial Notice to the Below, Motion to Vacate Magistrate Judge Denying Recusing Herself and Second Request for the Recusal of Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 7/22/2011. (CMM)
|
April 15, 2011 |
Filing
24
ORDER denying 22 Motion for Recusal of the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 4/15/2011. (JDL)
|
March 16, 2011 |
Filing
21
ORDER: The pltfs motions to proceed in forma pauperis (rec. docs. 2-6) are HELD IN ABEYANCE pending further Order of the court. FURTHER ORDERED that pltfs motion requesting federal marshal service of the complaint (rec. doc. 12) is DISMISSED as prem ature. FURTHER ORDERED that within 30 days of the date of this Order, pltfs must file an amended complaint, not to exceed 20 pages, which describes the specific actions or inactions by specific defts which gave rise to the violation of pltfs rights. Such complaint must be in compliance with FRCP Rule 8 and Local Rule 10.1. Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 3/15/2011. (JDL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?