Henderson v. Turner et al

Plaintiff: Latesha Henderson
Defendant: Unknown Covington, Unknown Owens, Unknown Smith, State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Dixon Correctional Institute and Joe Turner
Case Number: 3:2011cv00039
Filed: January 24, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2013 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 183 Motion in Limine as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Helen Ginger Berrigan on 02/26/2013. (kac)
February 25, 2013 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 178 Motion for Reconsideration. FURTHER ORDERED that by 4:30 p.m. on February 25, 2013, plaintiffs shall inform the Court in a memorandum filed into the record whether they wish to proceed on the wrongful death claim. La. C.C. 2315.2. Signed by Judge Helen Ginger Berrigan on 02/21/2013. (kac)
February 8, 2013 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 155 Motion in Limine, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Helen Ginger Berrigan on 02/08/2013. (kac)
February 6, 2013 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 161 Motion in Limine regarding causation. Signed by Judge Helen Ginger Berrigan on 02/05/2013. (kac)
February 5, 2013 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part, denying in part and dismissing in part 138 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Helen Ginger Berrigan on 02/04/2013. (kac)
January 28, 2013 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 141 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Helen Ginger Berrigan on 01/28/2013. (KAC)
October 29, 2012 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 109 Motion for Reconsideration re 105 Order on Motion to Compel. (CLM)
July 31, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS denying 87 Motion in Limine. FURTHER ORDERED that counsel arrange for another settlement conference with Magistrate Judge Roby within ten days. Signed by Judge Helen Ginger Berrigan on 7/31/12. (PLH)
March 12, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS granting 29 Motion in Limine to suppress testimony and evidence. Signed by Judge Helen Ginger Berrigan on 3/12/2012. (MM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Covington
Represented By: Douglas Gist Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Smith
Represented By: Douglas Gist Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Dixon Correctional Institute
Represented By: Douglas Gist Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Turner
Represented By: Douglas Gist Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latesha Henderson
Represented By: Nicholas R. Rockforte
Represented By: Patrick Wayne Pendley
Represented By: Donna Unkel Grodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?