Hensley v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Donald Hensley, Jr.
Defendant: John or Jane Doe, John Doe, Burl N. Cain and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2011cv00094
Filed: February 23, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2012 102 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 98 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, 83, be denied, and that the defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, 59, be granted, dismissing the plaintiff's claims asserted against the defendants, with prejudice, and that this action be dismissed. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 09/06/2012. (CGP)
January 20, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Motion for Order to Compel Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 1/19/2012. (LSM)
December 6, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as to 35 Motion to Compel Discovery. The Motion is granted as to the request for production of documents number 3, and in all other respects the motion to compel is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 12/5/2011. (LSM)
November 2, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 34 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judgeas to 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Burl N. Cain. The Motion to dismiss filed on behalf of Burl Cain is GRANTED and the claims against him are DISMISSED and this matter is referred back to te magistrate judge for further proceedings on the plaintiff's medical indifference claim. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/1/2011. (LSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hensley v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Hensley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl N. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?