McConnell v. Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Robert G. McConnell
Defendant: William D. Taylor and Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00153
Filed: March 15, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 69 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Unrelated Medical Conditions and Medical Expenses. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/15/2013. (LLH)
January 9, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING on 35 Motion to Compel Independent Medical Examinations and Vocational Rehabilitation Evaluations is granted, in part, as stated, and denied insofar as the defts sought reimbursement of "no-show" fee charged by Dr. Messina. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/9/2012. (JDL)
March 14, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss; granting 10 Motion to Change Venue. The Clerk is directed to transfer this cause of action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on March 14, 2011. (Cochran, Ronald) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 3/15/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McConnell v. Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert G. McConnell
Represented By: James E. Ross, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Lozes & Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?