Allen v. Cain et al

Petitioner: Derrick Jerome Allen
Respondent: N. Burl Cain and James D. Caldwell, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00211
Filed: March 30, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER OF DISMISSAL Adopting 46 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Petition Under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody filed by Derrick Jerome Allen is denied and this matter is hereby dismissed. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/20/2013. (SMG)
March 14, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 24 Motion to Compel and 26 Motion for Contempt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 3/14/2012. (LSM)
February 16, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Supplement State Court Record: IT IS ORDERED that within 10 days from the date of this order the Clerk of Court for the Nineteenth Judicial District Court shall supplement his response to this courts order by filing a certified copy of the e ntire State Court record as stated herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court serve, by certified mail or other means which provides tracking and delivery confirmation, a copy of this order on the Clerk of Court for the Nineteenth Judicial District.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 2/15/2012. (CMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Derrick Jerome Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James D. Caldwell, Jr.
Represented By: Jeanne Guillory Rougeau
Represented By: Allison Miller Rutzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?