Barlow v. Safety National Casualty Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Camilla Barlow
Defendant: Commercial Surety Consultants, Inc., Financial Recovery Agency, Inc., Safety National Casualty Corporation and Singletary & Associates, A.P.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00236
Filed: April 8, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion for Summary Judgment. Barlow's FDCPA claims against all Defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the reasons explained in this Order. Barlow's remaining Louisiana abuse of process claim is REMANDED for consideration by the 19th JDC. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/31/2014. (SMG) (Main Document 76 replaced on 3/31/2014) (SMG).
March 6, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS denying without prejudice 57 Motion to approve putative class communication. FURTHER ORDER that it is timely for this case to be returned to the Middle District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/6/2013. (CAA) Modified on 3/6/2013 (CAA).
July 24, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS denying 38 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/24/2012. (CAA)
May 31, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 5/30/2012. (CAA)
March 6, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, as stated herein. The Court will permit the plaintiff to amend complaint within seven days of this Order and Reasons. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/6/2012. (tsf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barlow v. Safety National Casualty Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camilla Barlow
Represented By: Andre' Phillip LaPlace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Surety Consultants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Recovery Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety National Casualty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singletary & Associates, A.P.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?