Fields v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Leroy Fields
Defendant: Johnny Tubbs, N. Burl Cain, James Douzart, Dennis Hall, Ray Jones, Chad Butler and Chad Menzina
Case Number: 3:2011cv00244
Filed: April 12, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2012 78 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 76 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This action is dismissed, without prejudice for failure of plaintiff to exhaust administrative remedies relative to his claims as mandated by 42 U.S.C. § 1997e, but with prejudice to re-assertion of the same claim or claims in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/29/2012. (SMG)
May 30, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Defendants motion for summary judgment (doc. 27), is denied, and this matter is referred back to the United States Magistrate Judge for an evidentiary hearing on the issue of administrative exhaustion.. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/30/2012. (PJH)
November 30, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 23 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The plaintiffs claims asserted against defendant Dennis Hall are herebydismissed for failure of the plaintiff to serve this defendant within 120 days as mandated by Rule 4( m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the motion to dismiss filed by defendants (doc. 14) is granted in part and denied in part, dismissing the plaintiffs claims asserted against defendants, Burl Cain, Chad Menzina, Chad Butler, Johnny Tubb s and Ray Jones, with prejudice, and this matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings in connection with plaintiffs claim against defendant James Douzart for failure to protect him from harm at the hands of a co-inmate on July27, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/30/2011. (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Tubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Douzart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Menzina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?