Kirby Inland Marine LP v. LBC Houston LP, et al

Plaintiff: Kirby Inland Marine LP
Defendant: LBC Houston, LP, LBC Operations (U.S.) LLC and LBC Baton Rouge LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv00264
Filed: April 21, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court PARTIAL JUDGMENT granting 88 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. JUDGMENT is hereby rendered in favor ofThird Party Defendant Intertek USA, Inc. and against Third Party Plaintiffs LBC Baton Rouge, L.L.C., LBC Houston, L.P., and LBC Opertations (U.S.), L.L.C. The Clerk of Court shall terminate Third Party Defendant Intertek USA, Inc. from this matter, and all consolidated matters. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 05/27/2014. (NLT)
March 31, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Third Party Defendant Intertek, USA Inc.'s ("Intertek") Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 72) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Third Party Plaintiffs LBC Houston, L.P., LBC Baton Rouge, L.L.C., and LBC Operations (U.S.), L.L.C.'s claims against Third Party Defendant Intertek, USA Inc. are hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/31/2014. (PJH)
September 11, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 56 Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint and 65 Motion for Conference. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 09/10/2013. (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirby Inland Marine LP v. LBC Houston LP, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LBC Houston, LP
Represented By: John Fredrick Kessenich
Represented By: Jon A. Van Steenis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LBC Operations (U.S.) LLC
Represented By: John Fredrick Kessenich
Represented By: Jon A. Van Steenis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LBC Baton Rouge LLC
Represented By: John Fredrick Kessenich
Represented By: Jon A. Van Steenis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirby Inland Marine LP
Represented By: Frilot L.L.C.
Represented By: Lara N. DiCristina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?