Douglas v. Mattel, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Donna Douglas
Defendant: Mattel, Inc. and CBS Consumer Products, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00297
Filed: May 4, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 1/5/12. (DCB)
December 27, 2011 20 MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice by All Parties. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit)(Shaheen, Philip)
August 16, 2011 17 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Mattel, Inc..(Mince, Loretta)
May 26, 2011 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Donna Douglas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B (p1), # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B (p2))(Shaheen, Philip) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/27/2011) (PAH). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/27/2011) (PAH). (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/27/2011) (PAH).
May 4, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against Mattel, Inc.( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 053N-676571.), filed by Donna Douglas.(Shaheen, Philip) Modified on 5/5/2011 to edit text (PAH). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2011: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B-P1, # 4 Exhibit B-P2) (JDL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas v. Mattel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Douglas
Represented By: Philip J. Shaheen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Consumer Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?