Bell v Hercules Liftboat, LLC

Plaintiff: Sue Bell
Defendant: Hercules Liftboat Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv00332
Filed: May 18, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2013 209 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 200 Motion to Review the Assessment of Costs Against Plaintiff. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court's taxation of costs is reversed; each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 07/16/2013. (SMG)
April 9, 2012 141 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL RULING regarding 127 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Sue Bell. Pursuant to Rule 45(c)(1) the pltf is awarded reasonable expenses in the amount of $250.00, to be paid by deft within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 4/9/2012. (JDL)
April 2, 2012 134 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 107 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/2/2012. (LSM)
February 23, 2012 116 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 60 Motion for Contempt and Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 2/23/2012. (LSM)
February 22, 2012 115 Opinion or Order of the Court PARTIAL RULING on 112 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by pltf is denied insofar as she sought an order compelling the defts to provide deposition dates, as stated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 2/22/2012. (JDL)
December 9, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Compel.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/8/2011. (LSM) Modified on 12/9/2011 to change document type (LSM).
July 15, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 5 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 07/15/2011. (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v Hercules Liftboat, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Bell
Represented By: Charlotte McDaniel McGehee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hercules Liftboat Company, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Paul Beiser
Represented By: Kyle A. Ferachi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?