Washington et al v. State of Louisiana et al

Plaintiff: Rosie Washington and Sheldon Washington
Defendant: Donald Barr, Burl Cain, Department of Public Safety & Corrections, L Bruce Dodd, Mary Annette Dubroc, Gwen Hardin, Ronald Jett, Louisiana State Penitentiary, Stayce Rodriguez Menzina-Falgout and State of Louisiana
Case Number: 3:2011cv00334
Filed: May 18, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2014 143 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING, ORDER, AND JUDGMENT: Defendants' 129 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants' are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.Defendants' request that costs be taxed against Plaintiffs is DENIED WITHOU T PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs' 130 MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT is DENIED. PLAINTIFFS' 134 MOTION REQUESTING PERMISSION TO FILE A REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS& #039; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT and Plaintiffs' 137 MOTION TO FILE REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO FILE REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment be entered in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 09/29/2014. (NLT)
September 30, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 89 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint. All claims against Linda Bordelon and Sharon Dunbar in their individual and official capacities be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/30/2013. (PJH)
September 23, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER regarding 88 Clarion Bay's Exception of Preemption, No Right of Action; and Alternatively Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B): The motion is DENIED, without prejudice to his ability to re-urge the motion at a later. Couns el for Plaintiff shall provide reasons for the failure to serve Mr. Bay beyond the period required by Rule 4(m) within 14 days of this date. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this claim against Mr. Bay with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/23/2013. (SMG)
September 19, 2013 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 Plaintiff's Objection to Ruling and 72 Objection to Ruling Dismissing Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Denying Statement of Judicial Interest. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 09/18/2013. (NLT)
August 9, 2013 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 103 Motion to Amend and Supplement Plantiff's FRCP 25 Motion to Substitute the Proper Party; granting 105 Second Motion to Amend and Supplement Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute and granting 101 Rule 25 Motion Requesting Substitution of Plaintiff Rosie Washington. Rosie Washington terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 08/08/2013. (CGP)
September 18, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 65 Report and Recommendations, of the U.S. Magistrate JudgeIT IS ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to strike reply brief (doc.53) is hereby DENIED;IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants motion to dismiss (doc. 25)is granted in part and denied in part as follows:Defendants motion to dismiss is GRANTED as to plaintiffs claims againstthe following defendants in their official capacities: State of Louisiana, Louisiana State Penitentiary, Department of Public Safety and Corrections and the individual defendants Burl Cain, Mary Anne Dubroc, Stayce Rodriguez Menzina-Falgout, Gwen Hardin, L. Bruce Dodd, Donald Barr, Ronald Jett.Defendants motion to dismiss is GRANTED as to plaintiffs federal claimsagainst the following defendants in t heir individual capacities: Burl Cain,Mary Anne Dubroc, Stayce Rodriguez Menzina-Falgout, Gwen Hardin, L. Bruce Dodd, Donald Barr, Ronald Jett.Defendants motion to dismiss is DENIED as to plaintiffs claims under TitleVII against the State of Louisian a, Louisiana State Penitentiary, andDepartment of Public Safety and Corrections.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants supplemental motion to dismiss (doc.35) is GRANTED as to plaintiffs state law claims against the following individual defendants in their individual capacities: Burl Cain, Mary Anne Dubroc, Stayce Rodriguez Menzina-Falgout, Gwen Hardin, L. Bruce Dodd, Donald Barr, Ronald Jett.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all of plaintiffs claims against individual defendants Jennifer Lemoine and Clarion Bay are DISMISSED, without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 4(m) for failure to serve the defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 09/18/2012. (CGP)
January 18, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER REFERRAL: Accordingly, pltfs' 38 is Denied insofar as pltfs seek a temporary restraining order, and; IT IS ORDERED that pltfs' 38 Motion for Injunctive Relief, insofar as the Court construes it as a motion for prelimina ry injunction, dfts' 25 motion to dismiss and dfts' 36 supplemental motion to dismiss are hereby Referred to the Magistrate Judge for such disposition as is appropriate.. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/18/2012. (CMM) Modified on 1/18/2012 to mark as a written opinion. (CMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington et al v. State of Louisiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheldon Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Safety & Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Bruce Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Annette Dubroc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwen Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Jett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stayce Rodriguez Menzina-Falgout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?