Stewart v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Charles Stewart
Defendant: Unknown Cashio, Unknown Conrad, Unknown Eby, Unknown Foster, Unknown Griffin, Unknown Larent, Unknown Barr and Burl Cain
Case Number: 3:2011cv00403
Filed: June 16, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 52 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 54 Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 3/26/2013. (JDL)
February 20, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 46 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The defendants' 33 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART, dismissing the plaintiff's excessive use of force claims against Capt. Darren Cashio, Lt. Kev in Griffin, Capt. Joseph Barr, Capt. Juan Conrad, and Lt. Col. Warren Foster. In all other respects the defendants' motion should be denied and this matter is referred back to the magistrate judgment for further proceedings on the plaintiff's deliberate indifference claim against Sgt. Raymond Laurent. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 02/20/2013. (SMG)
August 6, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 29 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge,, 14 Motion to Dismiss filed by Unknown Cashio, Unknown Conrad, Unknown Barr, Burl Cain, Unknown Larent, Unknown Foster, Unknown Griffin is GRANTED IN PART, dismissing the plaintiff's claims that: (1) defendants Capt. Barr andCapt. Conrad denied him medical treatment; (2) defendant Lt, Col. Foster verbally abused him; (3) and defendant Warden Cain failed to properly supervise, train and discipline his employees a nd denied the plaintiff's Administrative Remedy Procedure, In all other respects the defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED, Further, the court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over any state law claim, Further, the claims against Sgt. Eby are DISMISSED pursuant to Rule 4(m) for failure to serve the defendant. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 08/06/2012. (KDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Cashio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Eby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Larent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?