Arceneaux v. Lexington Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Alex Keith Arceneaux
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company, Vacuum Truck Rentals, LLC and James E Chancellor
Case Number: 3:2011cv00423
Filed: June 23, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING upholding 60 reasons previously orally assigned, the Plaintiff's 25 Motion in Limine is GRANTED and the opinion testimony of Todd Hoover shall be excluded at trial. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/11/2013. (LLH)
October 30, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER denying 54 and 55 Motions in Limine to Exclude and/or Limit Testimony. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/30/2013. (LLH)
June 5, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 26 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/4/2013. (LLH)
June 3, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 24 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/3/2013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arceneaux v. Lexington Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen Begnaud Emling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vacuum Truck Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Begnaud Emling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E Chancellor
Represented By: Stephen Begnaud Emling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Keith Arceneaux
Represented By: William H. Goforth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?