Landrum v. Cosco

Plaintiff: Jerry H Landrum
Defendant: Dorel Juvenile Group and Cosco
Unknown: Jonathan Judge and Ann MacDonald
Case Number: 3:2011cv00424
Filed: June 24, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 55 , 56 Motion in Limine and denying 57 , 58 and 59 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/1/2013. (LLH)
October 31, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Any Undisclosed Expert Opinions. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/31/2013. (SMG)
February 20, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 02/19/2013. (CGP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landrum v. Cosco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorel Juvenile Group
Represented By: Patrick J. Briney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Jonathan Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Ann MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry H Landrum
Represented By: Michael O. Hesse
Represented By: Aub A. Ward
Represented By: Geneva Landrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?