Smith v. Rheams et al

Plaintiff: Theodore Smith
Defendant: Kevin Benjamin, Trampus Butler, Herbert Duncan, Stewart Hawkins, Reginald Ladmiranto, Luke Rheams, Kendal Varner and Eli Wilson
Case Number: 3:2011cv00482
Filed: July 14, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2016 147 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Regarding 145 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/2/2016. (LLH)
August 20, 2015 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The following motions are DENIED: 136 138 Plaintiff's Motions for New Trial; 137 139 Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Production Filed Pursuant to FRCPRule 37(a)(2)(A); and 141 Plaintiff's Motion to Expand Evidence Record. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 08/19/2015. (NLT)
May 19, 2015 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Attorney General shall contact the Records Department at Elayn Hunt Correctional Center and facilitate the provision of and copying of Smith's document as necessary, so that trial in this matter will occur as scheduled. (trial schedul ed for 6/23/2015 - 6/24/2015) The Office of the Attorney General shall provide a copy of this Order, in its entirety, to Plaintiff Theodore Smith (DOC #313084) via facsimile to Elayn Hunt Correctional Center by close of business on Wednesday, 5/20/20 15. The contents of this order, as well as any and all future orders of this Court shall not be altered by prison officials or employees. Any future alteration of federal court orders shall result in the issuance of an order to show cause as well as the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/18/2015. (LLH)
April 21, 2015 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 112 MOTION for Continuance. The Jury Trial is reset for 6/23/2015 6/24/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson. The Office of the Attorney General shall provide a copy of this order, in its entiret y, to Plaintiff Theodore Smith (DOC #313084) via facsimile to Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. The Louisiana Department of Corrections and the Warden of Elayn Hunt Correctional Center, St.Gabriel, Louisiana produce Theodore Smith (DOC #313084) in-pers on for jury trial in this matter. The Louisiana Department of Corrections and the Warden of the Louisiana State Penitentiary in Angola, Louisiana produce the following witnesses for their appearance and testimony at the jury trial in this matter:Bur l Cain, Herbert Duncan, Stewart Hawkins, Mondrell Wilson (DOC #378506), Kem West (DOC #103468), Michael Strahan (DOC #91052). Counsel for Defendants put Candace Watkins on notice that she may be called to testify at the jury trial in this matter, in accordance with this Court's prior Ruling and Order of 2/2/2015 Docket # 104. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status for purposes of service of the order to produce by the United States Marshal. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 4/20/2015. (LLH)
February 20, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 48 the Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the 33 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defendants Capt. Luke Rheams and Maj. Trampus Butler be DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 02/20/2013. (SMG)
June 8, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting R&R of the U.S. Magistrate Judge....the Motion to Dismiss on behalf of defendants Capt. Lucas Rheams, Lt. Col. Eli Wilson, Maj. Trampus Butler, Maj. Stewart Hawkins, Maj. Kendal Varner, Kevin Benjamin and Herbert Duncan be granted in part, dismissing all of the plaintiffs claims against them, except for the claims against Capt. Rheams and Maj. Butler for issuing theplaintiff false disciplinary reports in retaliation for filing an ARP and providing a statement to investigators abo ut Capt. Rheams alleged wrongdoing. Further, the plaintiffs claims against Capt. Rheams and Maj. Butler for compensatory damages are dismissed pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(e)...Further, the Motion to Dismiss on behalf of Reginald Ladmirault isgranted and the claims against him are dismissed. Further, the court decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over any state law claim. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 06/07/2012. (KDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Rheams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trampus Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald Ladmiranto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Rheams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendal Varner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?